There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to place the burden of proof on the Secretary of the Treasury in civil cases and on the taxpayer in administrative proceedings, to require 30 days notice and judicial consent before lien or seizure, to increase the limit on recovery of civil damages for unauthorized collection actions and exclude such damages from income, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/29/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
09/29/1995Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/29/1995Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/09/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/09/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 11/09/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 11/09/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 11/09/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 11/09/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 11/09/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/09/1995
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 11/09/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 11/09/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 11/09/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/09/1995
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/09/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 12/04/1995
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 12/04/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 12/04/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 12/13/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 12/14/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/03/1996
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 01/03/1996
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 01/31/1996
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/21/1996
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 03/21/1996
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/21/1996
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/21/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/22/1996
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/22/1996
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/22/1996
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/15/1996
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/15/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/15/1996
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 04/15/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/15/1996
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 04/15/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/15/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/15/1996
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 04/15/1996
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/29/1996
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 09/09/1996
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 09/16/1996
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 09/19/1996

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means09/29/1995 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2450.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2450. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/29/1995)

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to place the burden of proof on the taxpayer in the case of any administrative proceeding and on the Secretary in the case of any court proceeding. Requires a 30-day notice before lien. Prohibits the Secretary from collecting any tax (or other sum) by levy without judicial consent. Requires a 30-day notice before seizure. Increases the limit on the recovery of civil damages for certain unauthorized collection actions to $1 million and excludes such damages from gross income.