Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 10/11/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 10/11/1995
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 10/11/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 10/11/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/26/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 10/26/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 10/26/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 11/08/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 11/08/1995
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5] 11/08/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 11/08/1995
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 11/08/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/08/1995
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 11/08/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 11/08/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 11/08/1995
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 11/08/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/08/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/08/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 11/08/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 11/08/1995
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 11/08/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 11/08/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 11/08/1995
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 11/08/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 11/08/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 11/08/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 11/08/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 11/08/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/08/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 11/13/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 11/13/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 11/13/1995
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 11/13/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/13/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 11/13/1995
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 11/13/1995
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 11/16/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/16/1995
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 11/16/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/16/1995
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 12/05/1995
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 12/05/1995
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/05/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 12/05/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 12/05/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 12/12/1995
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 12/12/1995
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/12/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 12/12/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 12/12/1995
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 01/05/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/05/1996
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/05/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/05/1996
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/05/1996
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 01/23/1996
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 01/23/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/29/1996
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/29/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/29/1996
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/29/1996
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/29/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/29/1996
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 03/13/1996
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/13/1996
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/13/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 03/13/1996