Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 10/11/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 10/11/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 10/11/1995
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 10/11/1995
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 11/10/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/10/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/13/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/20/1996
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 07/16/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/24/1996