Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2]* 10/11/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 10/11/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 10/11/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 10/11/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 10/26/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/26/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 03/29/1996
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/27/1996
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/24/1996
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 07/24/1996
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/24/1996
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 07/25/1996
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/05/1996
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 09/09/1996