Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 12/19/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 12/19/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 12/19/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 12/19/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 12/19/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 12/19/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 12/21/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 12/21/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 12/21/1995
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 12/21/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 12/21/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 12/21/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 12/21/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 12/21/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 12/21/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 12/21/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 12/21/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 02/01/1996
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 02/01/1996
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 02/01/1996
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 02/01/1996
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/01/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/01/1996
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 02/01/1996
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 02/01/1996
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 02/01/1996
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/01/1996
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 02/28/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 02/28/1996
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 02/28/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 02/28/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 02/28/1996
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 02/28/1996
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/28/1996
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 02/28/1996
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/28/1996
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/21/1996
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/21/1996
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/21/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/21/1996
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 03/21/1996
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 03/21/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/30/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/30/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 04/30/1996
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/30/1996
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 06/05/1996
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/05/1996
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 06/05/1996
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/05/1996
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/11/1996
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 07/11/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/11/1996
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/11/1996
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 07/11/1996
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 09/25/1996
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/25/1996