Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 10/18/1995
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9]* 10/18/1995
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 10/18/1995
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 10/18/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 10/18/1995
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 10/18/1995
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 10/18/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 10/18/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 10/18/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 10/18/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 10/18/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 10/18/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 10/18/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 10/18/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 10/18/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 10/18/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 10/18/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 10/30/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/30/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 10/30/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 11/10/1995
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 11/10/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 11/30/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 11/30/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 12/19/1995
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 12/19/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 01/26/1996
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 01/26/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 03/06/1996
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 03/06/1996
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 03/13/1996
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 03/19/1996
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/09/1996
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 05/09/1996
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 05/09/1996