Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 10/19/1995
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 10/19/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 10/19/1995
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 10/19/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 10/19/1995
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 10/19/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 10/24/1995
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 10/24/1995
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/24/1995
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 10/24/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 10/24/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 10/24/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 10/26/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/26/1995
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 10/26/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 11/01/1995
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 11/01/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 11/01/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/01/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 11/01/1995
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 11/13/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 11/13/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 11/15/1995
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 11/15/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/15/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 11/15/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/15/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 11/15/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/18/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 11/18/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 11/28/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 11/28/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 11/28/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 12/05/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 12/13/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/13/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/03/1996
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 01/03/1996
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 01/24/1996
Rep. Frisa, Dan [R-NY-4] 01/31/1996
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 01/31/1996
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 01/31/1996
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 01/31/1996
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/28/1996
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 02/28/1996
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 02/28/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/28/1996
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/28/1996
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 02/28/1996
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 02/28/1996
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 02/28/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/07/1996
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/07/1996
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/07/1996
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/07/1996
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/20/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/20/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/20/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/20/1996
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 03/20/1996
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/28/1996
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/28/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/28/1996
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 03/28/1996
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/28/1996
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 03/28/1996
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 04/16/1996
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/18/1996
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 04/18/1996
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/18/1996
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/24/1996
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/01/1996
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/01/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/14/1996
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 05/14/1996
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/15/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/23/1996
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/23/1996
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/30/1996
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 06/12/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 06/26/1996
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 07/10/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/10/1996
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/10/1996
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/16/1996
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 07/23/1996
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 07/23/1996
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 08/01/1996
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 09/05/1996
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 09/05/1996
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/05/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/05/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 09/11/1996
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/11/1996
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 09/18/1996
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/18/1996
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 09/18/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/18/1996
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/18/1996
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 09/19/1996
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/19/1996
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 09/19/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/24/1996
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/24/1996
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/24/1996
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 09/24/1996