There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Philanthropy Protection Act of 1995

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Philanthropy Protection Act of 1995

Short Titles as Reported to House

Philanthropy Protection Act of 1995

Short Titles as Introduced

Philanthropy Protection Act of 1995

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To facilitate contributions to charitable organizations by codifying certain exemptions from the Federal securities laws, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/08/1995Became Public Law No: 104-62. (TXT | PDF)
12/08/1995Signed by President.
11/30/1995Presented to President.
11/29/1995Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S17828)
11/28/1995Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: (3/5 required): 421 - 0 (Roll no. 822).
11/10/1995Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Commerce. H. Rept. 104-333.
10/24/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (27)

Date Chamber
12/08/1995Became Public Law No: 104-62. (TXT | PDF)
12/08/1995Signed by President.
11/30/1995HousePresented to President.
11/30/1995SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/29/1995SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S17828)
11/28/1995-5:53pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/28/1995-5:53pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: (3/5 required): 421 - 0 (Roll no. 822).
11/28/1995-5:30pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business.
11/28/1995-3:00pmHouseVOTE POSTPONED - At the conclusion of debate, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill, as amended, and announced that, by voice vote, three-fifths of the Members voting in the affirmative, the bill was passed. Mr. Markey objected to the vote on the grounds that a quroum was not present and made a point of order that a quorum was not present. The Chair postponed further consideration and without objection the point of no quorum was withdrawn.
11/28/1995-3:00pmHouseH.Amdt.908 On agreeing to the Bliley amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote.
11/28/1995-2:58pmHouseThe previous question was ordered on the amendment and the bill without objection.
11/28/1995-2:29pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate.
11/28/1995-2:29pmHouseH.Amdt.908 Amendment (A001) in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Bliley.
11/28/1995-2:28pmHouseConsidered from the Corrections Calendar. (consideration: CR H13670-13677, H13679-13680)
11/28/1995-2:28pmHouseCalled up from the Corrections Calendar for consideration.
11/14/1995HousePlaced on the Corrections Calendar, Calendar No. 8.
11/10/1995HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 178.
11/10/1995HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Commerce. H. Rept. 104-333.
11/01/1995HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
11/01/1995HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
10/31/1995HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Commerce Subcommittee on Telecommunications and Finance
10/31/1995HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Commerce Subcommittee on Telecommunications and Finance
10/31/1995HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Commerce Subcommittee on Telecommunications and Finance
10/27/1995HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Telecommunications and Finance.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
10/24/1995HouseReferred to the House Committee on Commerce.
10/24/1995HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E2006-2007)
10/24/1995HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Commerce10/24/1995 Referred to
11/01/1995 Markup by
11/10/1995 Reported by H. Rept. 104-333
House Commerce Subcommittee on Telecommunications and Finance10/27/1995 Referred to
10/31/1995 Hearings by
10/31/1995 Markup by
10/31/1995 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.2519.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2519. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (11/28/1995)

Philanthropy Protection Act of 1995 - Exempts from the jurisdiction of the Investment Company Act of 1940, the Securities Act of 1933, the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, and the Investment Advisers Act of 1940 any security issued by or any interest or participation in any pooled income fund, collective trust fund, collective investment fund, or similar fund maintained by a charitable organization exclusively for the collective investment and reinvestment of certain assets. Includes among such assets those of: (1) a charitable remainder trust or of any other trust the remainder interests of which are irrevocably dedicated to any charitable organization; (2) a trust the remainder interests of which are revocably dedicated to a charitable organization, subject to specified conditions; or (3) a trust the remainder interests of which are revocably dedicated to, or for the benefit of, one or more charitable organizations, if the ability to revoke is limited to specified circumstances. Deems such a charitable income fund, in specified circumstances, not to be an investment company under the Investment Company Act of 1940.

Amends the Investment Company Act of 1940 to set forth disclosure requirements for exempt charitable organizations.

Amends the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 to require solicitors of funds for such exempt charitable organizations to be volunteers or to be engaged in overall fund-raising activities of the organization but receiving no commission or other special compensation based on the amount of donations collected.

Exempts such charitable organizations from State regulation in general, and such securities from State registration or qualification requirements in particular.

Permits a State to enact a statute that specifically refers to this Act and provides prospectively that it does not preempt the laws of such State.