Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 10/25/1995
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 10/25/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 10/25/1995
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 10/25/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 10/25/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 10/25/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 10/25/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 10/25/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2]* 10/25/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 10/25/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 10/25/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 10/25/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 10/25/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 10/25/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 10/25/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 10/25/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 10/25/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 10/25/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 10/25/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 10/25/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 10/25/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 10/25/1995
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 10/25/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 10/25/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 10/25/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 10/25/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 10/25/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 11/01/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/29/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 11/29/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 11/29/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 11/29/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 11/29/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/29/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 12/05/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 12/05/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 12/05/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 12/12/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/12/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 12/12/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 12/12/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 12/12/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 12/12/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 12/12/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 12/12/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 12/15/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/15/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 12/15/1995
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 12/20/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 12/20/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/27/1996
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 02/28/1996
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/28/1996
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 03/14/1996
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 03/22/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/28/1996
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 03/28/1996
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/16/1996
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 04/18/1996
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 04/29/1996
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/29/1996
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 05/02/1996
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/20/1996
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 05/21/1996
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/21/1996
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/21/1996