Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 10/25/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/22/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 03/22/1996
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/22/1996
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 05/14/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/14/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/14/1996
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/14/1996
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/14/1996
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/29/1996
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/29/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/29/1996
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/29/1996
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/13/1996
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 06/13/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/09/1996
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 07/09/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 07/18/1996
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 07/18/1996