Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 10/26/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 10/26/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 10/26/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 10/26/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 10/26/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2]* 10/26/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 10/26/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9]* 10/26/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 10/26/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 10/26/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 10/31/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 10/31/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 10/31/1995
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5] 10/31/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/31/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/31/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/31/1995
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/31/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/31/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/31/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 10/31/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 10/31/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/31/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 10/31/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/02/1995
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 11/02/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 11/02/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/02/1995
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 11/02/1995
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 11/02/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/02/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 11/02/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 11/02/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/02/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/02/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 11/02/1995
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/08/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 11/08/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 11/08/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/08/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 11/08/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/13/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 11/13/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/13/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 11/13/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 11/13/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 11/13/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 11/13/1995
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 11/13/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/13/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 11/13/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 11/13/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 11/15/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/15/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 11/15/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/15/1995
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 11/15/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 11/15/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 11/17/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 11/17/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 11/28/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 12/12/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 12/12/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 12/12/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 12/12/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/12/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 12/12/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 12/12/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 12/20/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 01/03/1996
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 01/24/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 01/24/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 01/24/1996
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 02/01/1996
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/01/1996
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 02/01/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/05/1996
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/05/1996