Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 10/26/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6]* 10/26/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2]* 10/26/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 10/26/1995
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/08/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 11/08/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 11/08/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 11/08/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/08/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 11/08/1995
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 11/08/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 11/08/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/08/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/16/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 11/16/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 11/16/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 11/16/1995
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 11/16/1995
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 11/30/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 12/15/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 01/23/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 01/23/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 01/23/1996
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 02/01/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 02/01/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/01/1996
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/29/1996
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 02/29/1996
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/29/1996
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 02/29/1996
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/29/1996
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/07/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/13/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/13/1996
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/13/1996
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 03/19/1996
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/19/1996
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/19/1996
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/29/1996
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 03/29/1996
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/18/1996
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 04/18/1996
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/18/1996
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 04/23/1996
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 04/23/1996
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/23/1996
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/23/1996
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/25/1996
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/25/1996
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 05/08/1996
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 05/30/1996
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 09/05/1996