Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 10/31/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 10/31/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 10/31/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 10/31/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 10/31/1995
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 10/31/1995
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 10/31/1995
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 10/31/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 10/31/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 10/31/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 10/31/1995
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 11/16/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 11/29/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 12/07/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/07/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 12/22/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 01/23/1996
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 01/23/1996
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 01/23/1996
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 01/24/1996
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 01/25/1996
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 01/30/1996
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/27/1996
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/27/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 02/27/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/27/1996
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 02/27/1996
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/29/1996
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 03/05/1996
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/12/1996
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2] 03/22/1996
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/28/1996
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/15/1996
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/15/1996
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 04/15/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 04/16/1996
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/16/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/08/1996
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/21/1996
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 05/30/1996
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/04/1996
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 06/13/1996
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 06/26/1996
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/09/1996