Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 01/11/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 01/11/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 01/20/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 01/20/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 01/24/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 01/26/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/06/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/06/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/08/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 02/21/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/21/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 02/21/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/21/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 07/11/1995

Show cosponsors who withdrew