Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 01/11/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 01/11/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 01/11/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 01/11/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/11/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/11/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 01/11/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 01/11/1995
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/13/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 01/13/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 01/13/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 01/17/1995
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 01/17/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 01/17/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 01/17/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/17/1995
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 01/17/1995
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 01/17/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 01/17/1995
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 01/20/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/20/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 01/20/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 01/20/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 01/20/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 01/20/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 01/20/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 01/20/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 01/20/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 01/20/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/24/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 01/24/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 01/26/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/26/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 01/31/1995
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 01/31/1995
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 01/31/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 01/31/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 01/31/1995
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 01/31/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 01/31/1995
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 01/31/1995
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 01/31/1995
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 01/31/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 01/31/1995
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 01/31/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 01/31/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 01/31/1995
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 01/31/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 01/31/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 01/31/1995
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 01/31/1995
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 01/31/1995
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 01/31/1995
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 01/31/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/31/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 01/31/1995
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 01/31/1995
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 01/31/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/31/1995
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 01/31/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 01/31/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/02/1995
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 02/02/1995
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/02/1995
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 02/02/1995
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 02/02/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 02/02/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/08/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/08/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/08/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 02/08/1995
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 02/08/1995
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 02/08/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 02/08/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 02/10/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/10/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 02/15/1995
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/15/1995
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 02/15/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/15/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 02/23/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 02/23/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/24/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 03/03/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/03/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/14/1995
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/14/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/15/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/15/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/15/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/23/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/24/1995
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/05/1995
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/05/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/05/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 04/05/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 05/18/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 06/07/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/21/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/25/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 11/29/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/27/1996
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 04/15/1996
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/22/1996

Show cosponsors who withdrew