Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 11/09/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 11/09/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 11/09/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/04/1996
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 01/24/1996
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 02/28/1996
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/28/1996
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 09/27/1996