Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 11/16/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 11/16/1995
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/17/1995
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 11/17/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/17/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/17/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/17/1995
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 11/20/1995
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/20/1995
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 11/20/1995
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 11/28/1995
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 11/28/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 11/28/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 11/30/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/30/1995
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 12/05/1995
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 12/05/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/05/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/05/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 12/06/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 12/12/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 12/12/1995
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 12/13/1995
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 12/13/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 12/18/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 12/18/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 12/18/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 12/18/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 12/18/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 01/03/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 01/04/1996
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 01/05/1996
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 01/05/1996
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 01/05/1996
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 01/05/1996
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/05/1996
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 01/05/1996
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 01/05/1996
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 01/05/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 01/25/1996
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 01/25/1996
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/25/1996
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 01/25/1996
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 01/31/1996
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 01/31/1996
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 01/31/1996
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 01/31/1996
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 01/31/1996
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/01/1996
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 02/28/1996
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/28/1996
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 02/28/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/28/1996
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/28/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/28/1996
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/28/1996
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/29/1996
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 02/29/1996
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 02/29/1996
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/29/1996
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/29/1996
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 03/06/1996
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/12/1996
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/12/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/12/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/14/1996
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/28/1996
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 03/28/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/28/1996
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/15/1996
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 04/15/1996
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/23/1996
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 04/23/1996
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/23/1996
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/25/1996
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 05/14/1996
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/14/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 05/21/1996
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 06/11/1996
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 06/19/1996
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/26/1996
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/26/1996
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/11/1996
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/31/1996
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 09/05/1996
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 09/05/1996
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 09/19/1996
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/25/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/25/1996
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 10/02/1996