Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 11/16/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 11/16/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 11/16/1995
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 01/05/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/05/1996
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/05/1996
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 01/05/1996
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 01/05/1996
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 01/05/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/05/1996
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 01/05/1996
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/05/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 01/05/1996
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 01/05/1996
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/28/1996
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/28/1996
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 02/28/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/28/1996
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/28/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/28/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/28/1996
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/28/1996
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/28/1996
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/29/1996
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/29/1996
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/29/1996
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 04/29/1996
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/29/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/29/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/29/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/29/1996
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 04/29/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/29/1996
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 04/29/1996
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/29/1996
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/29/1996
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 04/29/1996
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/29/1996
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 04/29/1996
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/29/1996
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 04/29/1996
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/06/1996
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 06/12/1996
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/03/1996