Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 11/16/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 11/16/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 11/28/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/28/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/28/1995
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/28/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 11/28/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 11/28/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 11/28/1995
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/28/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/30/1995
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 11/30/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 11/30/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 11/30/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 11/30/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/30/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/30/1995
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 11/30/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 12/05/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 12/05/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 12/05/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 12/05/1995
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/05/1995
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 12/05/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/05/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/05/1995
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/06/1995
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/06/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 12/07/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/07/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 12/12/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/12/1995
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 12/12/1995
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 12/12/1995
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 12/12/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 12/12/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 12/12/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 12/15/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/15/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 12/15/1995
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/19/1995
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 12/19/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 12/19/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 01/24/1996
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 01/24/1996
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 01/24/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 01/24/1996
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 01/24/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/24/1996
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/24/1996
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/24/1996
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/27/1996
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/27/1996
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/27/1996
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 02/27/1996
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/27/1996
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/12/1996
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/17/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/08/1996
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 06/18/1996
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/29/1996
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/30/1996
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 07/31/1996
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 08/01/1996
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 08/01/1996
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 08/02/1996
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 08/02/1996
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/04/1996