Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 11/20/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/20/1995
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 11/20/1995
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 01/03/1996
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 01/03/1996
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 01/03/1996
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 01/03/1996
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 01/03/1996
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/03/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/03/1996
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/03/1996
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 01/03/1996
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 01/03/1996
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/03/1996
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 01/03/1996
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 01/03/1996
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 01/03/1996
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 01/04/1996
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 01/04/1996
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 01/04/1996
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 01/04/1996
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 01/04/1996
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 01/04/1996
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 01/04/1996
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/04/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/04/1996
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/04/1996
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 01/04/1996
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 01/04/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 01/04/1996
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/04/1996
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 01/04/1996
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 01/04/1996
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 01/04/1996
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 01/04/1996
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/04/1996
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 01/04/1996
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 01/04/1996
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 01/05/1996
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 01/05/1996
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 01/05/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/05/1996
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 01/05/1996
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/05/1996
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 01/05/1996
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/05/1996
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 01/05/1996
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 01/30/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 01/30/1996
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 02/01/1996