Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4]* 11/30/1995
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 11/30/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 12/15/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 12/15/1995
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 12/15/1995
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 12/15/1995
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 12/22/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/25/1996
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 01/25/1996
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 01/25/1996
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 01/25/1996
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 01/25/1996
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 01/25/1996
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 01/25/1996
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/06/1996
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/06/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/06/1996
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 03/06/1996
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/06/1996
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 03/06/1996
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/06/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/06/1996
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/06/1996
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 04/15/1996
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/15/1996
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 04/15/1996
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/15/1996
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/15/1996
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/09/1996
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/23/1996
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/10/1996
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 07/18/1996
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/18/1996
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/18/1996
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/25/1996
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 08/01/1996