Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 12/06/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 12/06/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 12/06/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4]* 12/06/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 12/06/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 12/06/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 12/06/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 12/06/1995
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 12/06/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 12/06/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 12/14/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 12/14/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/14/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 12/14/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 12/14/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 12/14/1995
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 12/14/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 12/20/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 12/20/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 12/20/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 12/20/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 01/04/1996
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/04/1996
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/01/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/29/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 02/29/1996
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/29/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 03/12/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/12/1996
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/12/1996
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/14/1996
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/14/1996
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/22/1996
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/29/1996
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2] 05/07/1996
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/07/1996
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 06/05/1996
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5] 06/05/1996
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 06/05/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/05/1996
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 06/06/1996
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/06/1996
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/12/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/12/1996
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 06/12/1996
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 06/12/1996
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/24/1996
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 06/24/1996
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 07/10/1996
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 07/10/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/10/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/10/1996
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/10/1996
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 08/02/1996
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 08/02/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/05/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/24/1996
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 09/25/1996