Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 12/07/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 12/07/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/13/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 12/14/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 12/15/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 12/15/1995
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11] 12/15/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 12/15/1995
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 12/18/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 12/18/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 12/21/1995
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 12/21/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 12/21/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/22/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 12/22/1995
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 12/22/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 01/24/1996
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/01/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 02/01/1996
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 02/01/1996
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/06/1996
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 02/13/1996
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 02/28/1996
Rep. Frisa, Dan [R-NY-4] 03/07/1996
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 03/12/1996
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/12/1996
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 03/14/1996
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/16/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/27/1996

Show cosponsors who withdrew