Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 12/07/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 12/12/1995
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 12/12/1995
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/13/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/13/1995
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 12/13/1995
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 12/13/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 12/13/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 12/19/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 12/19/1995
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 12/19/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 12/19/1995
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/19/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 12/19/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/19/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 12/19/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 12/19/1995
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 12/19/1995
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 12/19/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/19/1995
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 12/19/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 12/19/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/19/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 12/19/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 12/22/1995
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 12/22/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 12/22/1995
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/22/1995
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 12/22/1995
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 12/22/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 12/22/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/22/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/03/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 01/03/1996
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 01/03/1996
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 01/03/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/05/1996
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/05/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 01/05/1996
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 01/05/1996
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 01/25/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/25/1996
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 01/25/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/25/1996
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 01/25/1996
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 01/25/1996
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 01/25/1996
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 01/25/1996
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 01/25/1996
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 01/25/1996
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 01/25/1996
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/13/1996
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 02/13/1996
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/13/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/13/1996
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 02/13/1996
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 02/13/1996
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 02/13/1996
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 02/13/1996
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 02/13/1996
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 02/13/1996
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/13/1996
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/13/1996
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/27/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/27/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 02/27/1996
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/27/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 02/27/1996
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/27/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/27/1996
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/27/1996
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 02/29/1996
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 02/29/1996
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 02/29/1996
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 02/29/1996
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 02/29/1996
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 02/29/1996
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/29/1996
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 03/06/1996
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 03/06/1996
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/06/1996
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/06/1996
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/06/1996
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/06/1996
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/06/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/20/1996
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/20/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/20/1996
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/20/1996
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/20/1996
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 03/20/1996
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 03/27/1996
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/27/1996
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/27/1996
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 03/28/1996
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 04/15/1996
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 04/22/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/22/1996
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 04/29/1996
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/29/1996
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 05/22/1996
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/04/1996
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 06/04/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/04/1996
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/25/1996
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/25/1996
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/25/1996
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 06/25/1996
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 07/09/1996

Show cosponsors who withdrew