Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 12/07/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 12/21/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/22/1996
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 04/22/1996
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/06/1996
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/06/1996
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/10/1996
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/16/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/23/1996
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 05/23/1996
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 06/04/1996
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/05/1996