Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 12/07/1995
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/21/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 01/23/1996
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/04/1996
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 04/25/1996
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/30/1996
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/04/1996