Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 12/12/1995
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 12/12/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 12/12/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 12/12/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 12/12/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 12/12/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 12/12/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 12/12/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 12/14/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 12/14/1995
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 12/20/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/20/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 12/20/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 12/20/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 12/20/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 01/03/1996
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 01/03/1996
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/03/1996
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 01/05/1996
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 01/23/1996
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/23/1996
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 01/23/1996
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 01/23/1996
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 01/23/1996
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 02/01/1996
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/01/1996
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 02/01/1996
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 02/01/1996
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 02/01/1996
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/27/1996
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/27/1996
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 02/27/1996
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 02/27/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/27/1996
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 02/27/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 02/27/1996
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 02/27/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/07/1996
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/07/1996
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 03/07/1996
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/07/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 03/07/1996
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/07/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/12/1996
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/12/1996
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/12/1996
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/12/1996
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/13/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/22/1996
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 03/22/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/22/1996
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 03/22/1996
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/22/1996
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/29/1996
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/29/1996
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/29/1996
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/29/1996
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 04/15/1996
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/15/1996
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 04/15/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/18/1996
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 04/18/1996
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/25/1996
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 04/25/1996
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/07/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/07/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/16/1996
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/16/1996
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/16/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/30/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/30/1996
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 05/30/1996
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/30/1996
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/06/1996
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/13/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/13/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/13/1996
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/13/1996
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 06/20/1996
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/20/1996
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/27/1996
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/27/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/27/1996
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/11/1996
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/11/1996
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/11/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 07/11/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 07/11/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/18/1996
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/18/1996
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 07/25/1996
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 08/01/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 08/01/1996
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/10/1996
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/10/1996
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 09/10/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/10/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/10/1996
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/12/1996
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/12/1996
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/12/1996
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/19/1996