Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 01/31/1996
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 01/31/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/31/1996
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 01/31/1996
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 01/31/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/07/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 03/07/1996
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/07/1996
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 03/07/1996
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 03/07/1996
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/07/1996
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/22/1996
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 03/22/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/22/1996
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/24/1996
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/24/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/14/1996
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 05/14/1996