There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Medicare Preventive Benefits Improvement Act of 1995

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide for expanded coverage of preventive benefits under part B of the Medicare Program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/13/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
01/02/1996Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
12/20/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
12/14/1995Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E2361-2362)
Action By: House of Representatives
12/13/1995Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
12/13/1995Referred to House Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
12/13/1995Referred to the Committee on Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/13/1995Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/25/1996
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/25/1996
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/25/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 01/25/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/25/1996
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 01/25/1996
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 01/25/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 01/25/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 01/25/1996
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 02/01/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 02/01/1996
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 02/01/1996
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/01/1996
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 02/01/1996
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 02/01/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/01/1996
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/01/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/01/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/27/1996
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/27/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/27/1996
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/27/1996
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/27/1996
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/27/1996
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 02/27/1996
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/27/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/27/1996
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/28/1996
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/07/1996
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 03/07/1996
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/07/1996
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/21/1996
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/16/1996
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/25/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/29/1996
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/27/1996

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Commerce12/13/1995 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment01/02/1996 Referred to
House Ways and Means12/13/1995 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health12/20/1995 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2777.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2777. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/13/1995)

Medicare Preventive Benefits Improvement Act of 1995 - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to provide for expanded coverage of preventive benefits under part B (Supplementary Medical Insurance Benefits for the Aged and Disabled) of the Medicare program.

Makes all women over age 49 eligible for annual screening mammography benefit coverage. Waives the deductible co-payment on such benefit.

Makes women of childbearing age (if they have not had a negative result in such a test in each of the preceding three years), or at high risk of developing cervical cancer, eligible for yearly pap smears, by suspending in their cases a specified three-year frequency limitation on benefit coverage for screening pap smears. Makes such women eligible also for yearly screening pelvic exams, including a clinical breast exam. Makes other women eligible for triennial screening pelvic exams. Waives the deductible co-payment for such exams.

Adds coverage of screening procedures, with specified payment and frequency limitations, for early detection of colorectal cancer, including fecal occult blood test, flexible sigmoidoscopy, and colonoscopy for high risk individuals, as well as a barium enema if the Secretary of Health and Human Services finds that to be an appropriate alternative to a sigmoidoscopy or a colonoscopy. Directs the Secretary to make a decision within two years about covering screening barium enemas as such an alternative.

Adds biennial coverage of certain prostate cancer screening procedures for men over 50 years of age, including a digital rectal examination and a prostate-specific antigen blood test.

Adds coverage of the following diabetes screening benefits: (1) diabetes outpatient self-management training services; and (2) blood-testing strips (with payment based on inexpensive, routinely purchased durable medical equipment). Directs the Secretary to: (1) establish outcome measures to evaluate improvement of the health of Medicare beneficiaries with diabetes mellitus; and (2) submit recommendations to the Congress regarding modifications to the Medicare coverage of services for such beneficiaries.