Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 12/15/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 12/15/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 12/15/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 12/15/1995
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 12/15/1995
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 12/15/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 12/15/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 12/15/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 12/15/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 12/15/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 12/15/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 12/15/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 12/15/1995
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 12/15/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 12/15/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 12/15/1995
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 12/15/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 12/15/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 12/15/1995
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 12/15/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 12/15/1995
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 12/15/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 12/15/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 12/15/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 12/15/1995
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 12/15/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 12/15/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 12/15/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 12/15/1995
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 12/15/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 12/15/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 12/15/1995
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 12/15/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 12/15/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 12/15/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 12/15/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 12/15/1995
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 12/15/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/15/1995
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 12/15/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/15/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 12/15/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 12/15/1995
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 12/19/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 12/19/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 12/19/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/19/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 12/19/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 12/19/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 12/19/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 12/19/1995
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 12/19/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 12/19/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 12/19/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 12/19/1995
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 12/19/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 12/19/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 12/19/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 12/22/1995
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 12/22/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 12/22/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 12/22/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 12/22/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 12/22/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 12/22/1995
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 12/22/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 12/22/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 12/22/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 12/22/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 12/22/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 12/22/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 01/25/1996
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 01/25/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/25/1996
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/25/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 01/25/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 01/25/1996
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 01/25/1996
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 01/25/1996
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/25/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 01/25/1996
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/25/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 01/25/1996
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 01/25/1996
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 01/25/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 01/25/1996
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/25/1996
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/25/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 01/25/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 01/25/1996
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 01/25/1996
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5] 01/25/1996
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 01/25/1996
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/25/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 01/25/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/25/1996
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 01/25/1996
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 01/25/1996
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 02/01/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 02/01/1996
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/01/1996
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/01/1996
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/01/1996
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/01/1996
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/01/1996
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/01/1996
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/01/1996
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 02/01/1996
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/01/1996
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 02/28/1996
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/28/1996
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/28/1996
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 02/28/1996
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 02/28/1996
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/28/1996
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 02/28/1996
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/28/1996
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/28/1996
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 02/28/1996
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 02/28/1996
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 02/28/1996
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/28/1996