Refine your search

9 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
10/11/1996 Became Public Law No: 104-289. (TXT | PDF)
10/11/1996 Signed by President.
09/30/1996 Presented to President.
09/28/1996 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.(consideration: CR H12032-12033)
09/28/1996 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11704-11707)
09/28/1996 Senate Committee on Commerce discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/23/1996 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by voice vote.
06/26/1996 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science. H. Rept. 104-639.
12/14/1995 Introduced in House