There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Freedom from Government Competition Act of 1995

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require that the Federal Government procure from the private sector the goods and services necessary for the operations and management of certain Government agencies, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/04/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
01/15/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Management, Information and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform and Oversight
01/04/1995Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform and Oversight.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/04/1995Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 01/17/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 01/17/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 01/17/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 01/17/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 01/17/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 01/17/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 01/17/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/19/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 01/19/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 01/19/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 01/19/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 01/20/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 01/20/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 01/20/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 01/23/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 01/25/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/27/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 01/30/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 01/31/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 01/31/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/01/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/03/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 02/07/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/08/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/15/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/21/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/28/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/03/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 03/23/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 04/07/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/03/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/03/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 05/11/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 05/23/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/23/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 05/23/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/07/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 09/07/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/21/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 10/31/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 10/31/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 11/08/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 11/08/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 11/14/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/30/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 03/29/1996
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 04/15/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 09/05/1996

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Government Reform and Oversight01/04/1995 Referred to
House Government Reform and Oversight Subcommittee on Government Management, Information and Technology01/15/1995 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.28.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.28. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/04/1995)

Freedom from Government Competition Act of 1995 - Requires Federal agencies to obtain all goods and services necessary for or beneficial to the accomplishment of their authorized functions by procurement from private sources, unless: (1) the goods or services are required by law to be produced or performed, respectively, by the agency; or (2) the head of the agency determines and certifies to the Congress that Government production, manufacture, or provision of a good or service is necessary for national defense, that a good or service is so inherently governmental in nature that it is in the public interest to require production or performance by a Government employee, or that there is no private source capable of providing the good or service.

Requires the Director of the Office of Management and Budget to study and report to the Congress on: (1) agency activities which are inconsistent with such requirements; and (2) a schedule for transferring such activities to the private sector.