Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 12/18/1995
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 12/18/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 12/18/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/20/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 12/22/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 01/25/1996
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 01/25/1996
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/01/1996
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/01/1996
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 02/28/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/28/1996
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/28/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 02/28/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 02/28/1996
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/29/1996
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/05/1996
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/05/1996
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/07/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/14/1996
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/14/1996
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/21/1996
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/21/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/18/1996
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 04/18/1996
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 04/23/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 04/23/1996
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/23/1996
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 04/25/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/25/1996
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/25/1996
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/25/1996
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/25/1996
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 04/25/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 04/25/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/25/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/25/1996
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 04/25/1996
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/01/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/01/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/01/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/01/1996
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/01/1996
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/10/1996
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/10/1996
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11] 05/10/1996
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/10/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/10/1996
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/15/1996
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/15/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/15/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/15/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/16/1996
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/16/1996
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 05/30/1996
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 05/30/1996
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 05/30/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/30/1996
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 06/11/1996
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/13/1996
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 06/20/1996
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 06/26/1996
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 06/26/1996
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/26/1996
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 06/26/1996
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/26/1996
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/12/1996
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/12/1996
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/12/1996
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 07/18/1996
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/18/1996
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 07/18/1996
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/18/1996
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/26/1996
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/05/1996
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 09/05/1996
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/05/1996
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/17/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/17/1996
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/24/1996