Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 01/03/1996
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 01/03/1996
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 01/03/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/24/1996
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/24/1996
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 01/24/1996
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/25/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 01/25/1996
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 01/25/1996
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/29/1996
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 03/29/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/29/1996
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 03/29/1996

Show cosponsors who withdrew