Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 12/21/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/25/1996
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 01/25/1996
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 01/25/1996
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 01/25/1996
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/25/1996
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 01/25/1996
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 02/01/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/01/1996
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/01/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/01/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 02/01/1996
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/28/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 02/28/1996
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 02/28/1996
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/28/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/28/1996
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 03/04/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/12/1996
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 03/14/1996
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/19/1996
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/19/1996
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/22/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/17/1996
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/17/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 04/24/1996
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 04/29/1996
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/07/1996
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/23/1996
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/04/1996
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/12/1996
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 06/12/1996
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 06/25/1996
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/22/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 09/04/1996