Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 01/04/1996
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 01/04/1996
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 01/04/1996
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/04/1996
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 01/04/1996
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 01/04/1996
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 01/04/1996
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 01/05/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 01/25/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 01/25/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 02/28/1996
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 02/28/1996
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/12/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/12/1996