Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 02/01/1996
Rep. Frisa, Dan [R-NY-4] 02/01/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/01/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/01/1996
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/01/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 02/01/1996
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/01/1996
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/01/1996
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 02/01/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/28/1996
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/28/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/28/1996
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 02/28/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/28/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/07/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/07/1996
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 03/07/1996
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/19/1996
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/19/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 03/19/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/19/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/29/1996
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/29/1996
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/15/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/15/1996
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 04/15/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/30/1996
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 06/25/1996
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/27/1996
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/23/1996
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 09/25/1996