Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/20/1996
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/20/1996
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/20/1996
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 03/20/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/20/1996
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2] 03/20/1996
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/20/1996
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 03/20/1996
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 03/20/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/20/1996
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/20/1996
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 03/20/1996
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/20/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/20/1996
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/20/1996
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/20/1996
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/20/1996
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 03/20/1996
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 03/20/1996
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 03/20/1996
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/20/1996
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 03/20/1996
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/20/1996
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/20/1996
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/20/1996
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/20/1996
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/20/1996
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/20/1996
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 03/20/1996
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/20/1996
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/20/1996
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/20/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/20/1996
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/20/1996
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 03/20/1996
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 03/20/1996
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 03/20/1996
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/20/1996
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/20/1996
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/20/1996
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/20/1996
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 03/20/1996
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/20/1996
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/20/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 03/20/1996
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/20/1996
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 03/20/1996
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 03/20/1996
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/20/1996
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/20/1996
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 03/20/1996
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/20/1996
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/20/1996
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/20/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/20/1996
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/20/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/20/1996
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/20/1996
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 03/20/1996
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 03/20/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/20/1996
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 03/20/1996
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/20/1996
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 03/20/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/20/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 03/20/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/20/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/20/1996
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/20/1996
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 03/20/1996
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11] 03/20/1996
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 03/20/1996
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/20/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/20/1996
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/20/1996
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/20/1996
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/20/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/20/1996
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 03/20/1996
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/20/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/20/1996
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/20/1996
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/20/1996
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/20/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 03/20/1996
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/20/1996
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 03/20/1996
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 03/20/1996
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/20/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/20/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/20/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/20/1996
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 03/20/1996
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/20/1996
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/20/1996
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 03/20/1996
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 03/20/1996
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/20/1996
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/20/1996
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/20/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/20/1996
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 03/20/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/20/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/20/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/20/1996
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 03/20/1996
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/20/1996
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 03/20/1996
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/20/1996
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 03/20/1996
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/20/1996
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/20/1996
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/20/1996
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/20/1996
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 03/20/1996
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 03/20/1996
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/20/1996
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/20/1996
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/20/1996
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/20/1996
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/20/1996
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/20/1996
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 03/20/1996
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/20/1996
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/20/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/20/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/20/1996
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/20/1996
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 03/20/1996
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/20/1996
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/20/1996
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 03/20/1996
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/20/1996
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/20/1996
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/20/1996
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/20/1996
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/20/1996
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/20/1996
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 03/20/1996
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 03/20/1996
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 03/20/1996
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/20/1996
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/20/1996
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 03/20/1996
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/20/1996
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 03/20/1996
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 03/20/1996
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/20/1996
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/20/1996
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/20/1996
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/20/1996
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 03/20/1996
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 03/20/1996
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 03/20/1996
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/20/1996
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/20/1996
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 03/20/1996
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/20/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/20/1996
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/20/1996
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/20/1996
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/20/1996
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 03/20/1996
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 03/20/1996
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/20/1996
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 03/20/1996
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/20/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/20/1996
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/20/1996
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 03/20/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/20/1996
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/20/1996
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/20/1996
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/20/1996
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/20/1996
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 03/20/1996
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 03/20/1996
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/20/1996
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/20/1996
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/20/1996
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-At Large] 03/20/1996
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 03/20/1996
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/20/1996
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/20/1996
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/20/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/20/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/21/1996
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/21/1996
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/21/1996
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/22/1996
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/22/1996
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 03/27/1996
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 03/27/1996
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/30/1996
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2] 05/07/1996