Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/01/1996
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 02/01/1996
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 02/01/1996
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 02/01/1996
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 02/01/1996
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/01/1996
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/01/1996
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 02/29/1996
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 02/29/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 02/29/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 03/05/1996
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 03/21/1996
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/21/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/21/1996
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/21/1996
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 03/21/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/21/1996
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/21/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/21/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/21/1996
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 03/21/1996
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 03/29/1996
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/29/1996
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/29/1996
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 03/29/1996
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/29/1996
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/29/1996
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 03/29/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 04/16/1996
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 04/16/1996
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 04/16/1996
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/16/1996
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 04/16/1996
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 04/16/1996
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 04/16/1996
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/16/1996
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 04/25/1996
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 04/25/1996
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 04/25/1996
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/25/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/25/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/25/1996
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/14/1996
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/14/1996
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/14/1996
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/14/1996
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 05/14/1996
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 05/14/1996
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/14/1996
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 05/14/1996
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/14/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/14/1996
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/14/1996
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/14/1996
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/14/1996
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/30/1996
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/30/1996
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/30/1996
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/30/1996
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/30/1996
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/30/1996
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 05/30/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/30/1996
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/30/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/30/1996
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/30/1996
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/30/1996
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/30/1996
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/30/1996
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 05/30/1996
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/05/1996
Rep. Longley, James B., Jr. [R-ME-1] 06/05/1996
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/05/1996
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/05/1996
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 06/05/1996
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 06/05/1996
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 06/18/1996
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/18/1996
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 06/18/1996
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 06/18/1996
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 06/18/1996
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/18/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/18/1996
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/18/1996
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/18/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/19/1996
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 06/19/1996
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/19/1996
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/19/1996
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 06/19/1996
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 06/20/1996
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/20/1996
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/20/1996
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 06/25/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/25/1996
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/25/1996
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/25/1996
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/25/1996
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/25/1996
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/26/1996
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 06/26/1996
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 06/26/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/26/1996
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/27/1996
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 06/27/1996
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 07/10/1996
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 07/10/1996
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 07/10/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/10/1996
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 07/10/1996
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/10/1996
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 07/10/1996
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 07/10/1996
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/12/1996
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 07/12/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/12/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/16/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/30/1996
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/30/1996
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/30/1996
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 08/01/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 08/01/1996
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/01/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/04/1996
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 09/04/1996
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/04/1996
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/04/1996
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/04/1996
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/04/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 09/04/1996
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2] 09/04/1996
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/11/1996
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/11/1996
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/11/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/11/1996
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 09/11/1996
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/11/1996
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/11/1996
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/11/1996
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/11/1996
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 09/11/1996
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 09/11/1996
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/11/1996
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/11/1996
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 09/18/1996
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 09/18/1996
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 09/18/1996
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/18/1996
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 09/18/1996
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 09/18/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 09/18/1996
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 09/18/1996
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/18/1996
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/18/1996
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/18/1996
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 09/18/1996
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/18/1996
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 09/18/1996
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/18/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/25/1996
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/25/1996
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/25/1996
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 09/25/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 10/02/1996