Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 01/31/1996
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4]* 01/31/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 01/31/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 01/31/1996
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/23/1996
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/23/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/23/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 02/23/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/23/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/23/1996
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 02/23/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/23/1996
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/23/1996
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 02/27/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/28/1996
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/28/1996
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 03/07/1996
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/07/1996
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 03/07/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/07/1996
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/07/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/14/1996
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/28/1996
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/28/1996
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/28/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/28/1996
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/28/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 04/15/1996
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/25/1996
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 05/21/1996
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 05/21/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/16/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/17/1996
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/17/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/17/1996
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/17/1996
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/18/1996
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 07/18/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 07/22/1996
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/22/1996
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 07/22/1996