Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/01/1996
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 02/01/1996
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 02/27/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/27/1996
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 02/27/1996
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 02/27/1996
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/27/1996
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/27/1996
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/27/1996
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/27/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 02/27/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 02/27/1996
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 02/27/1996
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 02/27/1996
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/27/1996
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 02/27/1996
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 03/12/1996
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/12/1996
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/12/1996
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/12/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/12/1996
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 03/12/1996
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/12/1996
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/12/1996
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/12/1996
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 03/12/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/12/1996
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 03/12/1996
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 03/12/1996
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/12/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 03/12/1996
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 03/12/1996
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/12/1996
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/12/1996
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 03/12/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/12/1996
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 03/12/1996
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 03/12/1996
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 03/12/1996
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/12/1996
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 03/12/1996
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/12/1996
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 03/12/1996
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/12/1996
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/12/1996
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 03/12/1996
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/12/1996
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/13/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/13/1996
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/13/1996
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/13/1996
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 03/13/1996
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/13/1996
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/13/1996
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/14/1996
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/14/1996
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 03/14/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/14/1996
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/14/1996
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/14/1996
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/14/1996
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/14/1996
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/14/1996
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/14/1996
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/19/1996
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/19/1996
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 03/19/1996
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/19/1996
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/19/1996
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/20/1996
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 03/20/1996
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/20/1996
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/20/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/20/1996
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/22/1996
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/22/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/22/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 03/22/1996
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/22/1996
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 03/22/1996
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/26/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/26/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/26/1996
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/27/1996
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 03/27/1996
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/28/1996
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 04/16/1996
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 04/16/1996
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/16/1996
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 04/16/1996
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 04/16/1996
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 04/16/1996
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/16/1996
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 04/16/1996
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 04/16/1996
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 04/17/1996
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/17/1996
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 04/17/1996
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 04/24/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/24/1996
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/24/1996
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/24/1996
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 04/24/1996
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/01/1996
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 05/01/1996
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/01/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/01/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/01/1996
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/02/1996
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/02/1996
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/08/1996
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2] 05/08/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 05/08/1996
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/14/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/14/1996
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/14/1996
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 05/14/1996
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 05/21/1996
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/21/1996
Rep. Longley, James B., Jr. [R-ME-1] 05/30/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 05/30/1996
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/06/1996
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/10/1996
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/12/1996
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/13/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/13/1996
Rep. Frisa, Dan [R-NY-4] 06/20/1996
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/20/1996
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 06/26/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 06/26/1996
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 06/27/1996