Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 02/29/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 02/29/1996
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 03/06/1996
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/06/1996
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 03/06/1996
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 03/06/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 03/14/1996
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 03/14/1996
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/14/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/14/1996
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/28/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/28/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 03/28/1996
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 05/07/1996
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/19/1996
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 06/19/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 06/19/1996
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 06/19/1996
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/19/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 07/31/1996