Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 03/06/1996
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/14/1996
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 03/28/1996
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 05/07/1996
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 06/06/1996
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 06/06/1996
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/17/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/12/1996