Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3]* 02/01/1996
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 02/01/1996
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/06/1996
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 02/06/1996
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/06/1996
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/06/1996
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 02/06/1996
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 02/06/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/06/1996
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 02/06/1996
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 02/06/1996
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 02/06/1996
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/06/1996
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/06/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/06/1996
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 02/09/1996
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 02/09/1996
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/09/1996
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/09/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/09/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/09/1996
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 02/09/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/09/1996
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/09/1996
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/09/1996
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 02/09/1996
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/09/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/09/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/09/1996
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 02/09/1996
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/09/1996
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 02/09/1996
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 02/09/1996
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/09/1996
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/20/1996
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 02/20/1996
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/20/1996
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 02/20/1996
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/20/1996
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 02/20/1996
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 02/20/1996
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 02/20/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/20/1996
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 02/20/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/20/1996
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/23/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/23/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/23/1996
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 02/23/1996
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/23/1996
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 02/23/1996
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/23/1996
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 02/23/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 02/23/1996
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/23/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 02/23/1996
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/23/1996
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 02/23/1996
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/27/1996
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/27/1996
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 02/27/1996
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 02/27/1996
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 02/27/1996
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/27/1996
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/27/1996
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 02/27/1996
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 02/27/1996
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 02/27/1996
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/27/1996
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/28/1996
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 02/28/1996
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/28/1996
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/28/1996
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/28/1996
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 02/28/1996
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 02/28/1996
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/28/1996
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/29/1996
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/29/1996
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/29/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/29/1996
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/05/1996
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/05/1996
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 03/05/1996
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/05/1996
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/06/1996
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/06/1996
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11] 03/06/1996
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/06/1996
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-At Large] 03/06/1996
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/06/1996
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 03/12/1996
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 03/12/1996
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/14/1996
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 03/14/1996
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/14/1996
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 03/14/1996
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 03/14/1996
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/14/1996
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/14/1996
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 03/14/1996
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/14/1996
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/19/1996
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 03/19/1996
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 03/19/1996
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 03/19/1996
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 03/19/1996
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/20/1996
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 03/21/1996
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/21/1996
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/21/1996
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 03/25/1996
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/28/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/29/1996
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/15/1996
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 04/15/1996
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 04/15/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/15/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/17/1996