Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/27/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 02/27/1996
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/27/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 02/27/1996
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 02/27/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/27/1996
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19]* 02/27/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 02/27/1996
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 02/27/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/27/1996
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/27/1996
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 02/27/1996
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/27/1996
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/27/1996
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/27/1996
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/27/1996
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 02/27/1996
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/27/1996
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 02/27/1996
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 02/27/1996
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 02/27/1996
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/27/1996
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 02/27/1996
Rep. Frisa, Dan [R-NY-4] 02/29/1996
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 02/29/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 02/29/1996
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/29/1996
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 02/29/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/29/1996
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/29/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/29/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 03/05/1996
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/05/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/05/1996
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/05/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/05/1996
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/05/1996
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/12/1996
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/12/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/12/1996
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/12/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 03/12/1996
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/12/1996
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 03/12/1996
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/12/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/14/1996
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/14/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/14/1996
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/14/1996
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 03/14/1996
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/27/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/27/1996
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 03/27/1996
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/27/1996
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/27/1996
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/27/1996
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 03/27/1996
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/27/1996
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/27/1996
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/17/1996
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/17/1996
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/17/1996
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/17/1996
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/17/1996
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/17/1996
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/19/1996
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/24/1996
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 04/24/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/24/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/24/1996
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 04/24/1996
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 04/25/1996
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 04/25/1996
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 05/02/1996
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/02/1996
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/02/1996
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/02/1996
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/15/1996
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/15/1996
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 05/15/1996
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/15/1996
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 05/15/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/15/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 05/21/1996
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/21/1996
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/21/1996
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/29/1996
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 05/29/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/29/1996
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 05/29/1996
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/29/1996
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/29/1996
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/29/1996
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 05/30/1996
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/30/1996
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 05/30/1996
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 05/30/1996
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 05/31/1996
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/05/1996
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/05/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/05/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/05/1996
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/05/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/11/1996
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/11/1996
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 06/11/1996
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 06/11/1996
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/13/1996
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/13/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/13/1996
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/13/1996
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 06/18/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/18/1996
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 06/18/1996
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/20/1996
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/20/1996
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/20/1996
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/27/1996
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/27/1996
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/27/1996
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 07/09/1996
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/09/1996
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 07/09/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/12/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/12/1996
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 07/17/1996
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/24/1996
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/24/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 07/24/1996
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/24/1996
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/24/1996
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/26/1996
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 07/26/1996
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/26/1996
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 08/02/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/02/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 08/02/1996
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/05/1996
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/05/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/05/1996
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/10/1996
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 09/10/1996
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/10/1996
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/10/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/10/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/10/1996
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/10/1996
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/18/1996
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2] 09/18/1996
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/18/1996
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 09/18/1996
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/18/1996
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/18/1996
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 09/25/1996
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 09/25/1996
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 09/25/1996
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 09/25/1996
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 09/25/1996
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 09/25/1996
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/26/1996
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 09/26/1996
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 09/26/1996
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/27/1996
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/27/1996
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 09/27/1996
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 09/28/1996
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/28/1996
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/28/1996
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 09/30/1996