Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/29/1996
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/29/1996
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 02/29/1996
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 02/29/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 02/29/1996
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/29/1996
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 02/29/1996
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 02/29/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/29/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/29/1996
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22]* 02/29/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9]* 02/29/1996
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6]* 02/29/1996
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 02/29/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/29/1996
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/29/1996
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/29/1996
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/29/1996
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2]* 02/29/1996
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 02/29/1996
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 02/29/1996
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 02/29/1996
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/29/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 02/29/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/29/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/29/1996
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 02/29/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 03/05/1996
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/05/1996
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 03/05/1996
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/07/1996
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/12/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/25/1996
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/19/1996