Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/29/1996
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/05/1996
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/05/1996
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/05/1996
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 03/05/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/05/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/05/1996
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/05/1996
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/05/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/05/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/05/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 03/05/1996
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/07/1996
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/07/1996
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/07/1996
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/07/1996
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 03/07/1996
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/12/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/12/1996
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/12/1996
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/12/1996
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 03/12/1996
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/12/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/12/1996
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/12/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/19/1996
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/19/1996
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/19/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/22/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/22/1996
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/27/1996
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 03/27/1996
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/27/1996
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/15/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/15/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/15/1996
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 04/15/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/15/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/15/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/15/1996
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/15/1996
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 04/25/1996
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/25/1996
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/25/1996
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/25/1996
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/25/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 04/30/1996
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 04/30/1996
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 05/07/1996
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/07/1996
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/07/1996
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/07/1996
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 05/14/1996
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 05/14/1996
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/04/1996
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/05/1996
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/30/1996