Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/05/1996
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 03/05/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/05/1996
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 03/05/1996
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 03/05/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/05/1996
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 03/05/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/05/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/05/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/05/1996
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 03/05/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/05/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/05/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/05/1996
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/12/1996
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 03/12/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/12/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/12/1996
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 03/12/1996
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/12/1996
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 03/20/1996
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/20/1996
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 03/20/1996
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/20/1996
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/27/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 03/27/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/27/1996
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/27/1996
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/27/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 03/27/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/27/1996
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 03/27/1996
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/27/1996
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 04/18/1996
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/18/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/18/1996
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/18/1996
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/18/1996
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/18/1996
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/18/1996
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/18/1996
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/18/1996
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 04/18/1996
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 04/18/1996
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 04/18/1996
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/18/1996
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/18/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/08/1996
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 05/08/1996
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/08/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/08/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/08/1996
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/08/1996
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/08/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/08/1996
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/08/1996
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/08/1996
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/08/1996
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/08/1996
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/08/1996
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/15/1996
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/15/1996
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 05/15/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/15/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/15/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/21/1996
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 05/21/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 05/21/1996
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/21/1996
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 06/05/1996
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/05/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 06/05/1996
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/05/1996
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/05/1996
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 06/18/1996
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/18/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/18/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/18/1996
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/18/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/18/1996
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 06/18/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 06/27/1996
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/27/1996
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 06/27/1996
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 06/27/1996
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/27/1996
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 06/27/1996
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 06/27/1996
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 06/27/1996
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 06/27/1996
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/27/1996
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/27/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/16/1996
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/16/1996
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/16/1996
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 07/16/1996
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/16/1996
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/16/1996
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 07/16/1996
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-At Large] 07/16/1996
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/16/1996
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/16/1996
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/16/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/16/1996
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 07/16/1996
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 08/02/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 08/02/1996
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 08/02/1996
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 08/02/1996
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 08/02/1996
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 08/02/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 08/02/1996
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 08/02/1996
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 08/02/1996
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 08/02/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 08/02/1996
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 08/02/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/04/1996
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 09/04/1996
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/04/1996
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/04/1996
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/04/1996
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/04/1996
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/04/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 09/04/1996
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 09/04/1996
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/20/1996
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/20/1996
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 09/26/1996
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/26/1996
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 09/26/1996