Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 01/11/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 01/11/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 01/17/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 01/17/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 01/17/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/17/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 01/17/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/19/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 01/19/1995
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 01/19/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/19/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/19/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 01/19/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 01/19/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 01/23/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 01/26/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/26/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 01/31/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/31/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 02/03/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/03/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/03/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 02/09/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/09/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 02/09/1995
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/09/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/09/1995
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/09/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/09/1995
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 02/09/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 02/09/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/09/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 02/14/1995
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/14/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/14/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 02/14/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/14/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/22/1995
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 02/22/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/22/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/01/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 03/01/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/01/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/02/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/07/1995
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 03/10/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/10/1995
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 03/16/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/16/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/22/1995
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/24/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 03/24/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/29/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/04/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/02/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/09/1995
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 05/09/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 05/12/1995
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/12/1995
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/24/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 06/13/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/13/1995
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/13/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/13/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/13/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/16/1995
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/16/1995
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/27/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/27/1995
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/29/1995
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 06/29/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/30/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/30/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/30/1995
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/30/1995
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 07/11/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/11/1995
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/11/1995
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 07/13/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/13/1995
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/18/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/18/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/26/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 07/28/1995
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/06/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 09/21/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/29/1995
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 10/19/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/18/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 12/06/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/01/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/29/1996
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 02/29/1996
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/29/1996
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/29/1996
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/29/1996
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 02/29/1996
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/29/1996
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/29/1996
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 03/05/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/05/1996
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/13/1996
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/13/1996
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 03/21/1996
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 03/21/1996
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 04/18/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 04/18/1996
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 04/18/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/09/1996
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/09/1996
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 05/09/1996
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/05/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/13/1996
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/10/1996
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/17/1996
Rep. Longley, James B., Jr. [R-ME-1] 08/02/1996
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/19/1996