Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 01/24/1995
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/24/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 01/24/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 01/24/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/24/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 01/24/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 01/24/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/24/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 01/24/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 01/24/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 01/24/1995
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 01/24/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 01/24/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 01/24/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 01/24/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 01/24/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 01/24/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 01/24/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/26/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 01/26/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/26/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 01/26/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 01/26/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/26/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 01/26/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 01/26/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 01/26/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 01/26/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/09/1995
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 02/09/1995
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/09/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 02/09/1995
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 02/09/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/09/1995
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 02/10/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/10/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/21/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/21/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 02/21/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/21/1995
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 01/05/1996